Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1719 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Williams S.B. No. 1719
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 4, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 4, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain comprehensive development agreements of the
 Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2012.  NO EFFECT ON DEPARTMENT OBLIGATIONS.  Any
 authority for the department to enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement relating to improvements to Grand Parkway
 (State Highway 99) does not affect the obligation of the department
 to comply with the applicable requirements of an agreement entered
 into under Section 228.0111 in connection with the Grand Parkway
 project, including complying with the terms and conditions for the
 development, construction, and operation of the Grand Parkway that
 are prescribed in such an agreement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *