Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1736 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1736
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the College Credit for Heroes
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 302.0031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 302.0031.  COLLEGE CREDIT FOR HEROES PROGRAM. (a)  In
 this section, "institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  The commission shall establish and administer the
 College Credit for Heroes demonstration program to identify,
 develop, and support methods to maximize academic credit awarded by
 institutions of higher education to veterans and military
 servicemembers for military experience, education, and training
 obtained during military service in order to expedite the entry of
 veterans and military servicemembers into the workforce.
 (c)  The commission shall work cooperatively with other
 state agencies, including the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board, public junior colleges, and other institutions of higher
 education, to accomplish the purposes of this section.
 (d)  The commission may award grants to state, local, or
 private entities that perform activities related to the purposes of
 this section.
 (e)  The commission shall administer the program using money
 previously appropriated to the commission or received from federal
 or other sources.
 (f)  The commission may adopt rules as necessary for the
 administration of this section.
 (g)  Not later than November 1, 2012, the commission, after
 consultation with the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board,
 shall report to the legislature and the governor on:
 (1)  the results of any grants awarded under this
 section;
 (2)  the best practices for veterans and military
 servicemembers to achieve maximum academic credit at institutions
 of higher education for military experience, education, and
 training obtained during military service;
 (3)  measures needed to facilitate the award of
 academic credit by institutions of higher education for military
 experience, education, and training obtained during military
 service; and
 (4)  other related measures needed to facilitate the
 entry of trained, qualified veterans and military servicemembers
 into the workforce.
 (h)  This subsection and Subsection (g) expire January 1,
 2013.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *