S.B. No. 1788 AN ACT relating to planning for students enrolled in public school special education programs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 29.005, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows: (f) The written statement of a student's individualized education program may be required to include only information included in the model form developed under Section 29.0051(a). SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 29.0051 to read as follows: Sec. 29.0051. MODEL FORM. (a) The agency shall develop a model form for use in developing an individualized education program under Section 29.005(b). The form must be clear, concise, well organized, and understandable to parents and educators and may include only: (1) the information included in the model form developed under 20 U.S.C. Section 1417(e)(1); (2) a state-imposed requirement relevant to an individualized education program not required under federal law; and (3) the requirements identified under 20 U.S.C. Section 1407(a)(2). (b) The agency shall post on the agency's Internet website the form developed under Subsection (a). (c) A school district may use the form developed under Subsection (a) to comply with the requirements for an individualized education program under 20 U.S.C. Section 1414(d). SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 29.0111 to read as follows: Sec. 29.0111. BEGINNING OF TRANSITION PLANNING. Appropriate state transition planning under the procedure adopted under Section 29.011 must begin for a student not later than when the student reaches 14 years of age. SECTION 4. Not later than December 1, 2011, the Texas Education Agency shall develop the model form required under Section 29.0051, Education Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1788 passed the Senate on April 21, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 26, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2011, House granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2011, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1788 passed the House, with amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, one present not voting; May 27, 2011, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor