Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1788 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 1788
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 6, 2011,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 6, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1788 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development of a model individualized education
 program form by the Texas Education Agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.005, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The written statement of a student's individualized
 education program may be required to include only information
 included in the model form developed under Section 29.0051(a).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.0051.  MODEL FORM. (a)  The agency shall develop a
 model form for use in developing an individualized education
 program under Section 29.005(b).  The form must be clear, concise,
 well organized, and understandable to parents and educators and may
 include only:
 (1)  the information included in the model form
 developed under 20 U.S.C. Section 1417(e)(1);
 (2)  a state-imposed requirement relevant to an
 individualized education program not required under federal law;
 and
 (3)  the requirements identified under 20 U.S.C.
 Section 1407(a)(2).
 (b)  The agency shall post on the agency's Internet website
 the form developed under Subsection (a).
 (c)  A school district may use the form developed under
 Subsection (a) to comply with the requirements for an
 individualized education program under 20 U.S.C. Section 1414(d).
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2011, the Texas
 Education Agency shall develop the model form required under
 Section 29.0051, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *