Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1807 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1807
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 24, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 May 12, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1807 By:  Harris


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the 444th Judicial District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.640, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.640.  444TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (CAMERON AND WILLACY
 COUNTIES [COUNTY]). (a)  The 444th Judicial District is composed
 of Cameron and Willacy Counties [County].
 (b)  Section 24.601(b) does not apply to the 444th Judicial
 District when the court is sitting in Willacy County.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *