By: Hegar S.B. No. 1849 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 24, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; April 20, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 20, 2011, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1849 By: Harris A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to furthering stability and affordable service in the communications industry through the universal service fund. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 56.025, Utilities Code, is amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows: (g) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a local exchange company that has been receiving support under a commission order issued under this section before January 1, 2005, is entitled to continue to receive that support. The commission may not require the company to reimburse the commission for support that the company received under this section on or after January 1, 2005, and before the date this subsection takes effect. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *