Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1854 Senate Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 2, 2011      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1854 by Deuell (Relating to the women's health program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1854, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a positive impact of $83,738,684 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 2, 2011





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1854 by Deuell (Relating to the women's health program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1854 by Deuell (Relating to the women's health program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1854 by Deuell (Relating to the women's health program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

SB1854 by Deuell (Relating to the women's health program.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1854, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a positive impact of $83,738,684 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1854, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a positive impact of $83,738,684 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 $39,575,868   2013 $44,162,816   2014 $15,938,115   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 $39,575,868
2013 $44,162,816
2014 $15,938,115
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555    2012 $39,575,868 $24,880,668   2013 $44,162,816 $25,956,988   2014 $15,938,115 $9,321,926   2015 $0 $0   2016 $0 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555    2012 $39,575,868 $24,880,668   2013 $44,162,816 $25,956,988   2014 $15,938,115 $9,321,926   2015 $0 $0   2016 $0 $0  


2012 $39,575,868 $24,880,668
2013 $44,162,816 $25,956,988
2014 $15,938,115 $9,321,926
2015 $0 $0
2016 $0 $0

Fiscal Analysis

This bill would implement a recommendation in the report "Continue and Expand the Texas Medicaid Women's Health Program to Maximuize Federal Funds and State Savings" in the Legislative Budget Board's Government Effectiveness and Efficiency Report, submitted to the Eighty-second Texas Legislature, 2011. The bill would amend the Human Resources Code to operate the Women's Health Program as a program rather than as a demonstration project and would extend the program through September 1, 2016. The bill prohibits the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) from contracting with entities or affiliates of entities that perform or promote elective abortion.  HHSC would be required under the bill to cease operation of the Women's Health Program if a court decides this prohibition is invalid or enjoins its enforcement. The bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members in each house. Otherwise, it would take effect August 31, 2011.

This bill would implement a recommendation in the report "Continue and Expand the Texas Medicaid Women's Health Program to Maximuize Federal Funds and State Savings" in the Legislative Budget Board's Government Effectiveness and Efficiency Report, submitted to the Eighty-second Texas Legislature, 2011.

The bill would amend the Human Resources Code to operate the Women's Health Program as a program rather than as a demonstration project and would extend the program through September 1, 2016. The bill prohibits the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) from contracting with entities or affiliates of entities that perform or promote elective abortion.  HHSC would be required under the bill to cease operation of the Women's Health Program if a court decides this prohibition is invalid or enjoins its enforcement.

The bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members in each house. Otherwise, it would take effect August 31, 2011.

Methodology

Savings shown above are based on HHSC's estimate of continuing the Women's Health Program and are net of the cost of providing women's health services. These savings are assumed in the Committee Substitute for House Bill 1. Beginning January 1, 2014, women's health services will be available through the expanded coverage provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, and therefore savings and costs from this Act are only for the first four months of fiscal year 2014. Savings after this time would accrue to the program that replaces the Women's Health Program.

Savings shown above are based on HHSC's estimate of continuing the Women's Health Program and are net of the cost of providing women's health services. These savings are assumed in the Committee Substitute for House Bill 1.

Beginning January 1, 2014, women's health services will be available through the expanded coverage provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, and therefore savings and costs from this Act are only for the first four months of fiscal year 2014. Savings after this time would accrue to the program that replaces the Women's Health Program.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 537 State Health Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, JI, BH

 JOB, CL, JI, BH