Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1878 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Deuell, Rodriguez S.B. No. 1878
 (In the Senate - Filed March 16, 2011; March 28, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 26, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1878 By:  Rodriguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the program of all-inclusive care for the elderly.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 32.053, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by amending Subsections (a), (b), and (e) and adding Subsections
 (f), (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (a)  The department, as an integral [a] part of the medical
 assistance program, shall develop and implement a program of
 all-inclusive care for the elderly (PACE) in accordance with
 Section 4802 of the Balanced Budget Act of 1997 (Pub. L. No.
 105-33), as amended.  The department shall provide medical
 assistance to a participant in the PACE program in the manner and to
 the extent authorized by federal law.
 (b)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission [department] shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.  In adopting rules, the executive
 commissioner [department] shall:
 (1)  use the Bienvivir Senior Health Services of El
 Paso initiative as a model for the program; [and]
 (2)  ensure that a person is not required to hold a
 certificate of authority as a health maintenance organization under
 Chapter 843, Insurance Code, [the Texas Health Maintenance
 Organization Act (Chapter 20A, Vernon's Texas Insurance Code)] to
 provide services under the PACE program;
 (3)  ensure that participation in the PACE program is
 available as an alternative to enrollment in a Medicaid managed
 care plan under Chapter 533, Government Code, for eligible
 recipients, including recipients eligible for assistance under
 both the medical assistance and Medicare programs;
 (4)  ensure that managed care organizations that
 contract under Chapter 533, Government Code, consider the
 availability of the PACE program when considering whether to refer
 a recipient to a nursing home or other long-term care facility; and
 (5)  establish protocols for the referral of eligible
 persons to the PACE program.
 (e)  The [department, with the cooperation of the Texas]
 Department of [on] Aging and Disability Services and area agencies
 on aging[,] shall develop and implement a coordinated plan to
 promote PACE program sites operating under this section.  The
 department shall adopt policies and procedures, including
 operating guidelines, to ensure that caseworkers and any other
 appropriate department staff discuss the benefits of participating
 in the PACE program with long-term care clients.
 (f)  The department shall consider the PACE program as a
 community-based service option under any "Money Follows the Person"
 demonstration project or other initiative that is designed to
 eliminate barriers or mechanisms that prevent or restrict the
 flexible use of funds under the medical assistance program to
 enable a recipient to receive long-term services or supports in a
 setting of the recipient's choice.
 (g)  A PACE program site may coordinate with entities that
 are eligible to obtain discount prescription drug prices under
 Section 340B, Public Health Service Act (42 U.S.C. Section 256b),
 as necessary to enable the PACE program site to obtain those
 discounts.
 (h)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt a
 reimbursement methodology for the payment of the providers of
 services under the PACE program for purposes of encouraging a
 natural increase in the number of PACE program sites throughout the
 state.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0531 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0531.  PACE PROGRAM TEAM.  (a)  The Department of
 Aging and Disability Services shall establish a PACE program team
 composed of experienced personnel.  The team is responsible for:
 (1)  increasing public attention and awareness of the
 availability of PACE program sites;
 (2)  increasing the number of PACE program sites
 operating in this state; and
 (3)  serving as a liaison with the state and federal
 agencies responsible for administering the PACE program,
 participants in the program, and PACE program sites.
 (b)  The PACE program team shall conduct a study to evaluate
 the feasibility of implementing a statewide standard reimbursement
 rate for all providers of services under the PACE program.  Not
 later than September 1, 2012, the PACE program team shall submit to
 the Health and Human Services Commission a written report
 containing the findings of the study conducted under this
 subsection and the team's recommendations.  This subsection expires
 September 2, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *