Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB191 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 191
 (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 7, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to disposition of a contested case by the Texas Medical
 Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (a) and (a-1), Section 164.007,
 Occupations Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board by rule shall adopt procedures governing
 formal disposition of a contested case under Chapter 2001,
 Government Code. A formal hearing shall be conducted by an
 administrative law judge employed by the State Office of
 Administrative Hearings. After receiving the administrative law
 judge's findings of fact and conclusions of law, the board shall
 dispose of the contested case by issuing a final order based on the
 administrative law judge's findings of fact and conclusions of law
 [determine the charges on the merits].
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Section 2001.058(e), Government
 Code, the [The] board may not change a finding of fact or conclusion
 of law or vacate or modify an order of the administrative law judge.
 The board may obtain judicial review of any finding of fact or
 conclusion of law issued by the administrative law judge as
 provided by Section 2001.058(f)(5), Government Code. For each
 case, the board has the sole authority and discretion to determine
 the appropriate action or sanction, and the administrative law
 judge may not make any recommendation regarding the appropriate
 action or sanction [only if the board makes a determination
 required by Section 2001.058(e), Government Code].
 SECTION 2.  Subsections (a) and (a-1), Section 164.007,
 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to a contested
 case for which an administrative law judge employed by the State
 Office of Administrative Hearings issues written findings of fact
 and conclusions of law on or after the effective date of this Act.  A
 contested case for which an administrative law judge employed by
 the State Office of Administrative Hearings issues written findings
 of fact and conclusions of law before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the findings of fact and
 conclusions of law were issued, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *