Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB247 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapiro S.B. No. 247
 (In the Senate - Filed December 7, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 8, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 8, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Holocaust and Genocide
 Commission to participate in the establishment and operation of an
 affiliated nonprofit organization and provide grants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 449.052, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The commission may provide matching grants to assist in
 the implementation of the commission's goals and objectives.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 449.053, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may accept gifts and grants from a public
 or private source for the commission to use in performing the
 commission's powers and duties under this chapter.  The commission
 may participate in the establishment and operation of an affiliated
 nonprofit organization whose purpose is to raise funds for or
 provide services or other benefits to the commission.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *