Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB264 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 264
 (In the Senate - Filed December 15, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 April 11, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 11, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 264 By:  Jackson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain information provided by local workforce
 development boards regarding certain child-care providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2308.3171 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2308.3171.  INFORMATION ON QUALITY CHILD CARE.  (a)  In
 this section, "quality child-care indicator" means any appropriate
 indicator of quality services, including whether the provider of
 the services:
 (1)  meets the Texas Rising Star Provider criteria
 described by commission rules;
 (2)  is accredited by a nationally recognized
 accrediting organization approved by the commission;
 (3)  is certified under the school readiness
 certification system established under Section 29.161, Education
 Code;
 (4)  meets standards developed under Section
 29.155(g), Education Code; or
 (5)  has achieved any other measurable target that is
 relevant to improving the quality of child care in this state and
 that has been approved by the commission.
 (b)  Each board shall provide information on quality
 child-care indicators for each licensed or registered child-care
 provider in the area.
 (c)  Each board shall determine the manner in which to
 provide the information required by this section.
 SECTION 2.  Each local workforce development board shall
 implement Section 2308.3171, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 not later than January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *