Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB282 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 282
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 14, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 14, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 282 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eliminating certain reporting, planning, student
 developmental, and other requirements imposed on the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board or public institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (n), Section 51.3062, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (n)  Each institution of higher education, except a medical
 and dental unit, shall report annually to the board on the success
 of its students and the effectiveness of its Success Initiative.
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 61.086 and 61.9685, Education Code; and
 (2)  Section 2056.011, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *