Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB285 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris S.B. No. 285
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 23, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 23, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 285 By:  Harris


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exempting certain judicial officers from certain
 requirements for obtaining or renewing a concealed handgun license
 and to the authority of certain judicial officers to carry certain
 weapons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (1), Subsection (a), Section
 411.201, Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Active judicial officer" means:
 (A)  a person serving as a judge or justice of the
 supreme court, the court of criminal appeals, a court of appeals, a
 district court, a criminal district court, a constitutional county
 court, a statutory county court, a justice court, or a municipal
 court; [or]
 (B)  a federal judge who is a resident of this
 state; or
 (C)  a person appointed and serving as a master,
 magistrate, referee, or associate judge under Chapter 54 of this
 code or an associate judge under Chapter 201, Family Code.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 46.15, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Sections 46.02 and 46.03 do not apply to:
 (1)  peace officers or special investigators under
 Article 2.122, Code of Criminal Procedure, and neither section
 prohibits a peace officer or special investigator from carrying a
 weapon in this state, including in an establishment in this state
 serving the public, regardless of whether the peace officer or
 special investigator is engaged in the actual discharge of the
 officer's or investigator's duties while carrying the weapon;
 (2)  parole officers and neither section prohibits an
 officer from carrying a weapon in this state if the officer is:
 (A)  engaged in the actual discharge of the
 officer's duties while carrying the weapon; and
 (B)  in compliance with policies and procedures
 adopted by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice regarding the
 possession of a weapon by an officer while on duty;
 (3)  community supervision and corrections department
 officers appointed or employed under Section 76.004, Government
 Code, and neither section prohibits an officer from carrying a
 weapon in this state if the officer is:
 (A)  engaged in the actual discharge of the
 officer's duties while carrying the weapon; and
 (B)  authorized to carry a weapon under Section
 76.0051, Government Code;
 (4)  an active judicial officer as defined by Section
 411.201, Government Code, [a judge or justice of a federal court,
 the supreme court, the court of criminal appeals, a court of
 appeals, a district court, a criminal district court, a
 constitutional county court, a statutory county court, a justice
 court, or a municipal court] who is licensed to carry a concealed
 handgun under Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code;
 (5)  an honorably retired peace officer or federal
 criminal investigator who holds a certificate of proficiency issued
 under Section 1701.357, Occupations Code, and is carrying a photo
 identification that:
 (A)  verifies that the officer honorably retired
 after not less than 15 years of service as a commissioned officer;
 and
 (B)  is issued by a state or local law enforcement
 agency;
 (6)  a district attorney, criminal district attorney,
 county attorney, or municipal attorney who is licensed to carry a
 concealed handgun under Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code;
 (7)  an assistant district attorney, assistant
 criminal district attorney, or assistant county attorney who is
 licensed to carry a concealed handgun under Subchapter H, Chapter
 411, Government Code;
 (8)  a bailiff designated by an active judicial officer
 as defined by Section 411.201, Government Code, who is:
 (A)  licensed to carry a concealed handgun under
 Chapter 411, Government Code; and
 (B)  engaged in escorting the judicial officer; or
 (9)  a juvenile probation officer who is authorized to
 carry a firearm under Section 142.006, Human Resources Code.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *