Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB356 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 356     82R3639 VOO-D   By: Watson         Veteran Affairs & Military Installations         3/7/2011         As Filed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 356
82R3639 VOO-D By: Watson
 Veteran Affairs & Military Installations
 3/7/2011
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 356

82R3639 VOO-D

By: Watson

 

Veteran Affairs & Military Installations

 

3/7/2011

 

As Filed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The purpose of this legislation is to recognize any member of the Texas military forces who has served in Iraq or Afghanistan for a period of 30 consecutive days or 60 non-consecutive days with a Texas Campaign Medal.   Service members have already been recognized by the federal government. Camp Mabry is asking that the soldiers be recognized by the State of Texas.   The only existing Campaign Medal issued by the State of Texas is the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal, which is awarded to persons who served during the First Gulf War in 1990-1991.    This bill amends Section 431.134(a) of the Texas Government Code by adding two additional medals to the existing list of 12 military recognitions. The Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, will be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom or after August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New Dawn. The Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, will be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation Enduring Freedom.   There are currently approximately 20,000 soldiers eligible for the medals because they have been in combat in either Iraq or Afghanistan for 30 consecutive days or 60 non-consecutive days.   As proposed, S.B. 356 amends current law relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces inducted into federal service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   Rulemaking authority previously granted to the adjutant general is modified in SECTION 1 (Section 431.134, Government Code) of this bill.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 431.134(a), Government Code, as follows:   (a) Authorizes the adjutant general to adopt rules and regulations relating to certain awards, including the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which is to be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty, after March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom, or August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New Dawn; and Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which is to be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty. Makes nonsubstantive changes.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2011. 

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The purpose of this legislation is to recognize any member of the Texas military forces who has served in Iraq or Afghanistan for a period of 30 consecutive days or 60 non-consecutive days with a Texas Campaign Medal.

 

Service members have already been recognized by the federal government. Camp Mabry is asking that the soldiers be recognized by the State of Texas.

 

The only existing Campaign Medal issued by the State of Texas is the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal, which is awarded to persons who served during the First Gulf War in 1990-1991. 

 

This bill amends Section 431.134(a) of the Texas Government Code by adding two additional medals to the existing list of 12 military recognitions. The Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, will be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom or after August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New Dawn. The Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, will be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation Enduring Freedom.

 

There are currently approximately 20,000 soldiers eligible for the medals because they have been in combat in either Iraq or Afghanistan for 30 consecutive days or 60 non-consecutive days.

 

As proposed, S.B. 356 amends current law relating to awards for certain members of the state military forces inducted into federal service in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, and Enduring Freedom.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

Rulemaking authority previously granted to the adjutant general is modified in SECTION 1 (Section 431.134, Government Code) of this bill.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 431.134(a), Government Code, as follows:

 

(a) Authorizes the adjutant general to adopt rules and regulations relating to certain awards, including the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which is to be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty, after March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom, or August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New Dawn; and Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which is to be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal service from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the person was deployed while serving on active federal military duty. Makes nonsubstantive changes.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2011.