Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB390 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 7, 2011      TO: Honorable Craig Estes, Chair, Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Affairs      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB390 by Hegar (Relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by the Parks and Wildlife Department.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB390, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 7, 2011





  TO: Honorable Craig Estes, Chair, Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Affairs      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB390 by Hegar (Relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by the Parks and Wildlife Department.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Craig Estes, Chair, Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Affairs
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB390 by Hegar (Relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by the Parks and Wildlife Department.), As Introduced

 Honorable Craig Estes, Chair, Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Affairs 

 Honorable Craig Estes, Chair, Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Affairs 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB390 by Hegar (Relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by the Parks and Wildlife Department.), As Introduced

SB390 by Hegar (Relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by the Parks and Wildlife Department.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB390, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB390, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGame,Fish,Water Safety Ac9    2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   2015 $5,830,994   2016 $5,830,994   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGame,Fish,Water Safety Ac9    2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   2015 $5,830,994   2016 $5,830,994  


2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0
2015 $5,830,994
2016 $5,830,994

Fiscal Analysis

 The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to repeal 43.809 (the expiration of the Freshwater Fishing Stamp on September 1, 2014).  The bill would take immediate effect if the bill receives two-thirds the vote of members in both houses.  Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. 

The bill would amend the Parks and Wildlife Code to repeal 43.809 (the expiration of the Freshwater Fishing Stamp on September 1, 2014).  The bill would take immediate effect if the bill receives two-thirds the vote of members in both houses.  Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. 

Methodology

According to the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department, after netting agent commission fees, approximately $5,830,994 per fiscal year beginning in fiscal year 2015 would continue to be deposited to the credit of the General Revenue-Dedicated Game, Fish and Water Safety Account No. 9.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 802 Parks and Wildlife Department

802 Parks and Wildlife Department

LBB Staff: JOB, SZ, ZS, TB, LCO

 JOB, SZ, ZS, TB, LCO