Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB400 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shaprio, Nelson S.B. No. 400
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2011; February 2, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Government
 Organization; March 15, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 15, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the entities eligible to make purchases using the
 cooperative purchasing program administered by the comptroller.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2155.202, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2155.202.  MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL RETARDATION
 COMMUNITY CENTERS; ASSISTANCE ORGANIZATIONS; CHILD-CARE PROVIDERS.
 The following entities may purchase goods and services through the
 comptroller:
 (1)  a [A] community center for mental health and
 mental retardation services that receives state grants-in-aid
 under Subchapter B, Chapter 534, Health and Safety Code;
 (2)  [, and] an assistance organization as defined by
 Section 2175.001 that receives state funds; and
 (3)  a child-care provider that meets the Texas Rising
 Star Provider criteria described by Texas Workforce Commission
 rules [may purchase goods and services through the commission].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *