Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB434 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 434


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force to address the
 relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 531, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter W to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER W. TASK FORCE TO ADDRESS THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN
 DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND CHILD ABUSE AND NEGLECT
 Sec. 531.951.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 (2)  "Task force" means the Task Force to Address the
 Relationship Between Domestic Violence and Child Abuse and Neglect.
 Sec. 531.952.  ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE; COMPOSITION.
 (a)  The task force is established to examine the relationship
 between family violence and child abuse and neglect, develop policy
 recommendations, if needed, to address issues and effects resulting
 from that relationship, and develop comprehensive statewide best
 practices guidelines for both child protective services and family
 violence shelter centers.
 (b)  The task force is composed of:
 (1)  one member from the commission's Family Violence
 Program, appointed by the executive commissioner; and
 (2)  at least 17 members appointed by the presiding
 officer of the task force as follows:
 (A)  one member from the department;
 (B)  one member from a statewide family violence
 advocacy organization;
 (C)  one member from a statewide sexual assault
 advocacy organization;
 (D)  one member from a statewide advocacy
 organization that serves abused and neglected children in the
 foster care system;
 (E)  one member from a statewide child abuse
 advocacy organization;
 (F)  one member from a statewide organization with
 expertise in the establishment and operation of a children's
 advocacy center program;
 (G)  one member who is a mental health
 professional with experience working with clients affected by child
 abuse and domestic violence;
 (H)  one member who is a judge with experience
 working with cases involving child protective services;
 (I)  one member from The University of Texas
 School of Law domestic violence clinic;
 (J)  one member from The University of Texas
 School of Law children's rights clinic;
 (K)  one member from each of four different family
 violence centers as defined by Section 51.002, Human Resources
 Code, reflecting the geographic diversity of the state;
 (L)  one member from a legal assistance
 organization involved with child protection and family violence
 issues;
 (M)  one member from the law enforcement
 community;
 (N)  one member who is a licensed physician who
 specializes in child abuse pediatrics; and
 (O)  any other member that the presiding officer
 determines to be appropriate.
 Sec. 531.953.  VACANCY.  A vacancy on the task force shall be
 filled in the same manner as the original appointment.
 Sec. 531.954.  PRESIDING OFFICER. The member representing
 the commission's Family Violence Program serves as the presiding
 officer of the task force.
 Sec. 531.955.  MEETINGS. The task force shall meet at the
 call of the presiding officer.
 Sec. 531.956.  COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT.  Members of the
 task force serve without compensation or reimbursement for
 expenses.
 Sec. 531.957.  DUTIES. (a)  The task force shall:
 (1)  receive reports and testimony from individuals,
 state and local agencies, community-based organizations, and other
 public and private organizations, including:
 (A)  adult survivors of family violence that have
 been impacted by child protective services investigations; and
 (B)  young adults who as children were impacted by
 both family violence and child protective services intervention;
 and
 (2)  develop policy recommendations for addressing the
 relationship between family violence and child abuse and neglect
 and develop comprehensive statewide best practices guidelines for
 both child protective services and family violence shelter centers.
 (b)  In developing policy recommendations and best practices
 guidelines under Subsection (a)(2), the task force shall:
 (1)  examine the findings and recommendations of the
 National Council of Juvenile and Family Court Judges Family
 Violence Department's report "Effective Intervention in Domestic
 Violence & Child Maltreatment Cases: Guidelines for Policy and
 Practice"; and
 (2)  examine the key concepts regarding child safety
 plans and decision making found in the 2009 edition of the American
 Bar Association's "Child Safety: A Guide for Judges and
 Attorneys."
 (c)  The task force shall prepare a report that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the task force;
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the task
 force, including the proposed policy recommendations and
 guidelines required by Subsection (a)(2); and
 (3)  any legislation or other matter that the task
 force considers appropriate.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2012, the task force shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the appropriate committees of the
 senate and the house of representatives the report required by
 Subsection (c).
 Sec. 531.958.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The commission shall
 provide reasonably necessary administrative and technical support
 for task force activities.
 Sec. 531.959.  RULEMAKING ASSISTANCE. The department shall
 seek the assistance of the task force if the department proposes to
 adopt or amend a rule as the result of the work done by the task
 force.
 Sec. 531.960.  APPLICABILITY OF ADVISORY COMMITTEE LAW.
 Chapter 2110 does not apply to the task force.
 Sec. 531.961.  ABOLITION OF TASK FORCE; EXPIRATION OF
 SUBCHAPTER.  The task force is abolished and this subchapter
 expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the appropriate persons shall appoint the members of
 the Task Force to Address the Relationship Between Domestic
 Violence and Child Abuse and Neglect created by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 434 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 434 passed the House on
 May 19, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 148, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor