Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB434 Senate Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 5, 2011      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB434 by Nelson (relating to the establishment of a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would establish a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect; require the task force to submit a report with findings and recommendations by September 1, 2012; and require the Health and Human Services Commission to provide reasonably necessary administrative and technical support for task force activities. The bill would be effective immediately with a two-thirds vote of all members of each house, or on September 1, 2011. The task force would be abolished on September 1, 2013. It is assumed any cost to implement provisions of the bill would be minimal and can be absorbed within available resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 720 The University of Texas System Administration   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, NM    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 5, 2011





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB434 by Nelson (relating to the establishment of a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB434 by Nelson (relating to the establishment of a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB434 by Nelson (relating to the establishment of a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

SB434 by Nelson (relating to the establishment of a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would establish a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect; require the task force to submit a report with findings and recommendations by September 1, 2012; and require the Health and Human Services Commission to provide reasonably necessary administrative and technical support for task force activities. The bill would be effective immediately with a two-thirds vote of all members of each house, or on September 1, 2011. The task force would be abolished on September 1, 2013. It is assumed any cost to implement provisions of the bill would be minimal and can be absorbed within available resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 720 The University of Texas System Administration

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 720 The University of Texas System Administration

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, NM

 JOB, CL, NM