Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB472 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: West S.B. No. 472
 (In the Senate - Filed February 1, 2011; February 14, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 March 7, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 472 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to voting practices and elections of property owners'
 associations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 209.003, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The following provisions of this chapter do not apply to
 a property owners' association that is a mixed use master
 association that existed before January 1, 1974, and that does not
 have the authority under a dedicatory instrument or other governing
 document to impose fines:
 (1)  Section 209.0058; and
 (2)  Section 209.00593.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 209, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Sections 209.0058, 209.0059, 209.00592, and 209.00593 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 209.0058.  BALLOTS. (a)  Any vote cast in an election
 or vote by a member of a property owners' association must be in
 writing and signed by the member.
 (b)  Electronic votes cast under Section 209.00593
 constitute written and signed ballots.
 (c)  In an association-wide election, written and signed
 ballots are not required for uncontested races.
 Sec. 209.0059.  RIGHT TO VOTE. (a)  A provision in a
 dedicatory instrument that would disqualify a property owner from
 voting in an association election of board members or on any matter
 concerning the rights or responsibilities of the owner is void.
 (b)  This section does not apply to a property owners'
 association that is subject to Chapter 552, Government Code, by
 application of Section 552.0036, Government Code.
 Sec. 209.00592.  BOARD MEMBERSHIP. (a)  Except as provided
 by Subsection (b), a provision in a dedicatory instrument that
 restricts a property owner's right to run for a position on the
 board of the property owners' association is void.
 (b)  If a board is presented with written, documented
 evidence from a database or other record maintained by a
 governmental law enforcement authority that a board member has been
 convicted of a felony or crime involving moral turpitude, the board
 member is immediately ineligible to serve on the board of the
 property owners' association, automatically considered removed
 from the board, and prohibited from future service on the board.
 Sec. 209.00593.  VOTING; QUORUM.  (a)  The voting rights of
 an owner may be cast or given:
 (1)  in person or by proxy at a meeting of the property
 owners' association;
 (2)  by absentee ballot in accordance with this
 section;
 (3)  by electronic ballot in accordance with this
 section; or
 (4)  by any method of representative or delegated
 voting provided by a dedicatory instrument.
 (b)  An absentee or electronic ballot:
 (1)  may be counted as an owner present and voting for
 the purpose of establishing a quorum only for items appearing on the
 ballot;
 (2)  may not be counted, even if properly delivered, if
 the owner attends any meeting to vote in person, so that any vote
 cast at a meeting by a property owner supersedes any vote submitted
 by absentee or electronic ballot previously submitted for that
 proposal; and
 (3)  may not be counted on the final vote of a proposal
 if the motion was amended at the meeting to be different from the
 exact language on the absentee or electronic ballot.
 (c)  A solicitation for votes by absentee ballot must
 include:
 (1)  an absentee ballot that contains each proposed
 action and provides an opportunity to vote for or against each
 proposed action;
 (2)  instructions for delivery of the completed
 absentee ballot, including the delivery location; and
 (3)  the following language:  "By casting your vote via
 absentee ballot you will forgo the opportunity to consider and vote
 on any action from the floor on these proposals, if a meeting is
 held.  This means that if there are amendments to these proposals
 your votes will not be counted on the final vote on these measures.
 If you desire to retain this ability, please attend any meeting in
 person.  You may submit an absentee ballot and later choose to
 attend any meeting in person, in which case any in-person vote will
 prevail."
 (d)  For the purposes of this section, "electronic ballot"
 means a ballot:
 (1)  given by:
 (A)  e-mail;
 (B)  facsimile; or
 (C)  posting on an Internet website;
 (2)  for which the identity of the property owner
 submitting the ballot can be confirmed; and
 (3)  for which the property owner may receive a receipt
 of the electronic transmission and receipt of the owner's ballot.
 (e)  If an electronic ballot is posted on an Internet
 website, a notice of the posting shall be sent to each owner that
 contains instructions on obtaining access to the posting on the
 website.
 (f)  This section supersedes any contrary provision in a
 dedicatory instrument.
 (g)  This section does not apply to a property owners'
 association that is subject to Chapter 552, Government Code, by
 application of Section 552.0036, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 209.0059, Subsection (a), Section
 209.00592, and Section 209.00593, Property Code, as added by this
 Act, apply to a provision in a dedicatory instrument enacted
 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *