Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB478 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 478
 (In the Senate - Filed February 1, 2011; February 14, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
 Affairs; March 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 3, Nays 0; March 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the protection of stray bison.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (1), Section 142.001, Agriculture
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Estray" means stray livestock, stray exotic
 livestock, stray bison, or stray exotic fowl.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *