Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB489 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser, Duncan, Estes S.B. No. 489
 (In the Senate - Filed February 1, 2011; February 14, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 7, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas State Technical College System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (5), Section 135.011, Education
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (5)  "Campus" means a [residential] unit of the system
 that grants associate degrees and certificates.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 135.02, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas State Technical College System is composed of:
 (1)  a system office located in the city of Waco in
 McLennan County;
 (2)  a campus located in the city of Harlingen in
 Cameron County;
 (3)  a campus serving West Texas that operates as a
 collective unit of strategically positioned permanent locations
 [located] in the city of Sweetwater in Nolan County, the city of
 Abilene in Taylor County, the city of Brownwood in Brown County, and
 the city of Breckenridge in Stephens County;
 (4)  a campus located in the city of Marshall in
 Harrison County;
 (5)  a campus located in the city of Waco in McLennan
 County; and
 (6)  [extension centers in the city of Brownwood in
 Brown County and the city of Abilene in Taylor County and an
 extension program offered through a rural technology center in the
 city of Breckenridge in Stephens County; and
 [(7)  other] campuses assigned to the system from time
 to time by specific legislative Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *