Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB497 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Jackson, Van de Putte, Lucio S.B. No. 497
 (In the Senate - Filed February 1, 2011; February 14, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 March 28, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 28, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 497 By:  Jackson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of the construction or expansion of a
 wind-powered electric generation facility located near a federally
 owned or operated radar installation or military installation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 5, Utilities Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 252 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 252.  NOTIFICATION OF CONSTRUCTION OR EXPANSION OF CERTAIN
 WIND-POWERED ELECTRIC GENERATION FACILITIES
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 252.001.  DEFINITION.  In this chapter, "commission"
 means the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
 Sec. 252.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER.  This chapter
 applies to the construction or expansion of a wind-powered electric
 generation facility if:
 (1)  the construction or expansion is estimated to cost
 at least $10,000; and
 (2)  any part of the construction or expansion will
 occur within 25 miles of the boundaries of a federally owned or
 operated radar installation or military installation included on
 the notification list described by Section 252.052.
 [Sections 252.003-252.050 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER B.  REQUEST FOR NOTIFICATION
 Sec. 252.051.  REQUEST FOR NOTIFICATION.  A federally owned
 or operated radar installation or military installation may request
 that the commission notify the installation of a planned
 construction or expansion project if any part of the construction
 or expansion will occur within 25 miles of the boundaries of the
 installation.
 Sec. 252.052.  NOTIFICATION LIST.  (a)  The commission shall
 create and maintain a list of federally owned or operated radar
 installations and military installations that have requested
 notification from the commission under Section 252.051.
 (b)  The commission shall publish the notification list
 required by this section on its Internet website and provide a copy
 of the list to each person who requests a copy.
 Sec. 252.053.  PROCEDURES RELATING TO LIST.  The commission
 may establish procedures to enable federally owned or operated
 radar installations and military installations to request
 notification and to be included on the notification list required
 by Section 252.052, including procedures relating to the
 information and installation must provide to the commission.
 [Sections 252.054-252.100 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER C.  NOTIFICATION OF CONSTRUCTION OR EXPANSION
 Sec. 252.101.  NOTIFICATION TO COMMISSION.  (a)  A person
 who intends to begin a construction or expansion project to which
 this chapter applies shall provide written notice to the commission
 of the planned construction or expansion.  The commission shall set
 a deadline by which the notification required by this section must
 be provided.
 (b)  The notice required under Subsection (a) must include:
 (1)  the name of the person planning the construction
 or expansion;
 (2)  the location of the planned construction or
 expansion;
 (3)  a detailed description of any construction or
 expansion that will extend 200 feet or higher above ground level,
 including the final proposed height of that construction or
 expansion; and
 (4)  the name and location of each federally owned or
 operated radar installation or military installation included on
 the notification list described by Section 252.052 and whose
 boundaries are within 25 miles of any part of the planned
 construction or expansion.
 (c)  The commission may charge a fee in an amount provided by
 commission rule to a person who provides written notice of a
 construction or expansion project to the commission under this
 section.  The amount of the fee may not exceed an amount reasonably
 necessary to recover the cost of administering this chapter.
 Sec. 252.102.  NOTIFICATION BY COMMISSION.  Not later than
 the 25th day after the date the commission receives notice of a
 proposed construction or expansion project under Section 252.101,
 the commission shall provide a copy of the notice to:
 (1)  any federally owned or operated radar installation
 or military installation that the commission determines is included
 on the notification list described by Section 252.052 and that has
 boundaries within 25 miles of the proposed project;
 (2)  each county or municipality that the commission
 determines has boundaries within 25 miles of a federally owned or
 operated radar installation or military installation described by
 Subdivision (1);
 (3)  the office of the governor;
 (4)  the Texas Military Preparedness Commission;
 (5)  the office of the comptroller of public accounts;
 (6)  the State Energy Conservation Office; and
 (7)  the General Land Office.
 Sec. 252.103.  ELECTRONIC REPORTING TO COMMISSION;
 ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION OF INFORMATION BY COMMISSION.  (a)  The
 commission shall encourage the use of electronic submission through
 the Internet, to the extent practicable, for submitting the notice
 required by Section 252.101.  The commission may adjust fees
 assessed under this chapter as necessary to encourage electronic
 submission.  An electronic report must be submitted in a format
 prescribed by the commission.
 (b)  The commission may transmit electronically the notice
 required by Section 252.102.
 [Sections 252.104-252.150 reserved for expansion]
 SUBCHAPTER D.  PROCEDURES
 Sec. 252.151.  CONSULTATION CONCERNING PROCEDURES.  The
 commission shall consult with the office of the governor, the Texas
 Military Preparedness Commission, the office of the comptroller of
 public accounts, the State Energy Conservation Office, and the
 General Land Office in developing and amending procedures to
 implement and administer this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2012, the Public
 Utility Commission of Texas shall adopt procedures necessary to
 implement Chapter 252, Utilities Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies only to construction or
 expansion of a wind-powered electric generation facility that
 begins on or after the effective date of this Act.  Construction or
 expansion of a wind-powered electric generation facility that began
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the construction or expansion began, and that law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *