Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB509 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 509


 AN ACT
 relating to the validation of a home-rule charter for certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The home-rule charter of a general-law
 municipality that by an election adopted a home-rule charter after
 June 1, 2009, and before December 31, 2009, is validated as of the
 date of the election.
 (b)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  the adoption of a home-rule charter or the
 attempted adoption of a home-rule charter that, under a statute of
 this state, was a misdemeanor or felony at the time the act or
 proceeding occurred;
 (2)  the adoption of a home-rule charter by a
 municipality that was incorporated or attempted to incorporate
 within the incorporated boundaries or extraterritorial
 jurisdiction of another municipality that occurred without the
 consent of the other municipality in violation of Chapter 42 or 43,
 Local Government Code;
 (3)  an action that was premised on an ordinance that,
 at the time it was passed, was preempted by a statute of this state
 or the United States, including Section 1.06 or 109.57, Alcoholic
 Beverage Code; or
 (4)  a matter that on the effective date of this
 section:
 (A)  is involved in litigation if the litigation
 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final
 judgment of a court; or
 (B)  has been held invalid by a final judgment of a
 court.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 509 passed the Senate on
 March 17, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 509 passed the House on
 May 13, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor