Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB514 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Birdwell, et al. S.B. No. 514
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 7, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the acquisition of land and facilities by the Texas
 State Technical College System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 135.02, Education Code,
 as amended by Chapter 268 (S.B. 1357), Acts of the 72nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1991, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *