Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB519 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 519
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 23, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 23, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period during which a motion for a new trial in a
 criminal proceeding in a justice or municipal court must be made.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 45.037, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 45.037.  MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL. A motion for a new trial
 must be made within five days [one day] after the rendition of
 judgment and sentence, and not afterward.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a judgment in a criminal proceeding entered on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A judgment in a criminal proceeding
 entered before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the judgment was entered, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *