Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB563 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 563


 AN ACT
 relating to the efficiency of the operations of, and certain
 information regarding services provided by, the Texas Workforce
 Commission; providing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.068 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.068.  EFFICIENCY PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  The
 commission shall establish a pilot program to:
 (1)  improve the efficiency and quality of commission
 operations while reducing costs; and
 (2)  adopt a structured approach for identifying the
 wasteful use of state resources and improving commission processes.
 (b)  In implementing the pilot program, the commission shall
 use:
 (1)  a methodology that includes a define, measure,
 analyze, improve, and control structure for reviewing project
 management;
 (2)  a continuous improvement technique that:
 (A)  identifies value and a value stream;
 (B)  creates a flow for activities;
 (C)  allows consumers to pull products or services
 through the process; and
 (D)  allows for the process to be perfected over
 time; and
 (3)  a measurement system analysis to evaluate data.
 (c)  Not later than August 1, 2012, the commission shall
 submit a written report on the effectiveness of the pilot program to
 the:
 (1)  governor;
 (2)  lieutenant governor;
 (3)  speaker of the house of representatives;
 (4)  Senate Committee on Government Organization;
 (5)  House Government Efficiency and Reform Committee;
 and
 (6)  house and senate committees with primary
 jurisdiction over state affairs.
 (d)  The commission shall implement the pilot program from
 available funds that may be used for that purpose.
 (e)  A state agency, other than the commission, may implement
 the pilot program established under this section with respect to
 the agency. An agency that implements the pilot program shall:
 (1)  submit the written report in the time and manner
 described by Subsection (c); and
 (2)  use available resources to fund the pilot program.
 (f)  A report required by this section may be submitted
 electronically.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 301.085, Labor Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.085.  UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION AND JOB MATCHING
 SERVICES INFORMATION; OFFENSE; PENALTY.
 SECTION 3.  Section 301.085, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (c), and (d) and adding Subsection (b-1)
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Job matching services information" means
 information in the records of the commission that pertains to the
 commission's job matching services provided to employers and job
 seekers through the Internet, workforce centers, or other means.
 (2)  "Unemployment[, "unemployment] compensation
 information" means information in the records of the commission
 that pertains to the administration of Subtitle A, including any
 information collected, received, developed, or maintained in the
 administration of unemployment compensation benefits or the
 unemployment compensation tax system.
 (b-1)  The commission shall adopt and enforce reasonable
 rules governing the confidentiality, custody, use, preservation,
 and disclosure of job matching services information.  The rules
 must include safeguards to protect the confidentiality of
 identifying information regarding any individual or any past or
 present employer or employing unit contained in job matching
 services information, including any information that foreseeably
 could be combined with other publicly available information to
 reveal identifying information regarding the individual, employer,
 or employing unit, as applicable.
 (c)  Unemployment compensation information and job matching
 services information are [is] not public information for purposes
 of Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (d)  Unless permitted by this subchapter or commission rule,
 a person commits an offense if the person solicits, discloses,
 receives, or uses, or authorizes, permits, participates in, or
 acquiesces in another person's use of, unemployment compensation
 information or job matching services information that reveals:
 (1)  identifying information regarding any individual
 or past or present employer or employing unit; or
 (2)  information that foreseeably could be combined
 with other publicly available information to reveal identifying
 information regarding any individual or past or present employer or
 employing unit.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 563 passed the Senate on
 March 24, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 563 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 26, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 148, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor