Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB573 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Nichols, Gallegos, Patrick S.B. No. 573
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 18, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 18, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 573 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for
 water or sewer services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.254, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (a-2) and adding Subsections (a-5) and
 (a-6) to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission at any time after notice and hearing
 may[, on its own motion or on receipt of a petition described by
 Subsection (a-1),] revoke or amend any certificate of public
 convenience and necessity with the written consent of the
 certificate holder or if it finds that:
 (1)  the certificate holder has never provided, is no
 longer providing, is incapable of providing, or has failed to
 provide continuous and adequate service in the area, or part of the
 area, covered by the certificate;
 (2)  in an affected county as defined in Section
 16.341, the cost of providing service by the certificate holder is
 so prohibitively expensive as to constitute denial of service,
 provided that, for commercial developments or for residential
 developments started after September 1, 1997, in an affected county
 as defined in Section 16.341, the fact that the cost of obtaining
 service from the currently certificated retail public utility makes
 the development economically unfeasible does not render such cost
 prohibitively expensive in the absence of other relevant factors;
 (3)  the certificate holder has agreed in writing to
 allow another retail public utility to provide service within its
 service area, except for an interim period, without amending its
 certificate; or
 (4)  the certificate holder has failed to file a cease
 and desist action pursuant to Section 13.252 within 180 days of the
 date that it became aware that another retail public utility was
 providing service within its service area, unless the certificate
 holder demonstrates good cause for its failure to file such action
 within the 180 days.
 (a-2)  A landowner is not entitled to make the election
 described in Subsection (a-1) or (a-5) but is entitled to contest
 under Subsection (a) the involuntary certification of its property
 in a hearing held by the commission if the landowner's property is
 located:
 (1)  within the boundaries of any municipality or the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality with a population
 of more than 500,000 and the municipality or retail public utility
 owned by the municipality is the holder of the certificate; or
 (2)  in a platted subdivision actually receiving water
 or sewer service.
 (a-5)  As an alternative to decertification under Subsection
 (a) and expedited release under Subsection (a-1), the owner of a
 tract of land that is at least 25 acres and that is not receiving
 water or sewer service may petition for expedited release of the
 area from a certificate of public convenience and necessity and is
 entitled to that release if the landowner's property is located in a
 county with a population of at least one million, a county adjacent
 to a county with a population of at least one million, or a county
 with a population of more than 200,000 and less than 220,000.
 (a-6)  The commission shall grant a petition received under
 Subsection (a-5) not later than the 60th day after the date the
 landowner files the petition.  The commission may not deny a
 petition received under Subsection (a-5) based on the fact that a
 certificate holder is a borrower under a federal loan program.  The
 commission may require an award of compensation to a decertified
 retail public utility that is the subject of a petition filed under
 Subsection (a-5) as otherwise provided by this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *