Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB587 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 587
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 23, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 23, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to jurisdiction in certain proceedings brought by the
 attorney general with respect to charitable trusts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 123.005, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 123.005.  BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY:  VENUE;
 JURISDICTION.  (a)  Venue in a proceeding brought by the attorney
 general alleging breach of a fiduciary duty by a charitable entity
 or a fiduciary or managerial agent of a charitable trust shall be a
 court of competent jurisdiction in Travis County or in the county
 where the defendant resides or has its principal office.  To the
 extent of a conflict between this subsection and any provision of
 the Texas Probate Code providing for venue of a proceeding brought
 with respect to a charitable trust created by a will that has been
 admitted to probate, this subsection controls.
 (b)  A statutory probate court of Travis County has
 concurrent jurisdiction with any other court on which jurisdiction
 is conferred by Section 4A, Texas Probate Code, in a proceeding
 brought by the attorney general alleging breach of a fiduciary duty
 with respect to a charitable trust created by a will that has been
 admitted to probate.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a proceeding commenced on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A proceeding commenced before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *