Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB628 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 628
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 15, 2011, rereferred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; March 28, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; March 28, 2011, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Childress County Hospital District
 to provide facilities and services for persons who are elderly or
 disabled; providing authority to issue bonds and notes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1012, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 1012.114 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1012.114.  FACILITIES OR SERVICES FOR PERSONS WHO ARE
 ELDERLY OR DISABLED. (a)  The district may:
 (1)  purchase, construct, acquire, repair, renovate,
 equip, or administer the following types of facilities or services
 for the care of persons who are elderly or disabled:
 (A)  a nursing home or similar long-term care
 facility;
 (B)  elderly housing;
 (C)  assisted living;
 (D)  home health;
 (E)  personal care;
 (F)  special care; or
 (G)  continuing care; and
 (2)  purchase, acquire, repair, or equip durable
 medical equipment to provide services to persons who are elderly or
 disabled.
 (b)  For a facility or service described by Subsection (a),
 the board may:
 (1)  lease or enter into an operating or management
 agreement relating to all or part of a facility or service that is
 owned by the district;
 (2)  close, transfer, sell, or otherwise convey all or
 part of a facility; and
 (3)  discontinue all or part of a service.
 (c)  The board may issue general obligation bonds, revenue
 bonds, and other notes to acquire, construct, or improve a facility
 for the care of persons who are elderly or disabled or to implement
 the delivery of a service for the care of persons who are elderly or
 disabled.
 (d)  For the purposes of this section, a facility or service
 described by Subsection (a) is a hospital project under Chapter
 223, Health and Safety Code, notwithstanding Section 223.002 of
 that chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *