Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB632 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 632
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2011; February 17, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Government
 Organization; March 24, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; March 24, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of the Information Resources Management
 Act to public junior colleges and public junior college districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.0075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.0075.  EXCEPTION:  PUBLIC JUNIOR COLLEGE. This
 chapter does not apply to a public junior college or a public junior
 college district, except as necessary for participation in the
 electronic government project implemented under Subchapter I.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *