Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB633 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 633
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2011;
 February 23, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Higher Education; March 14, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays  0; March 14, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the educational scope of Texas A&M University--Corpus
 Christi.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 87.401, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 87.401.  ESTABLISHMENT; SCOPE. (a)  Texas A&M
 University--Corpus Christi is a general academic teaching
 [coeducational educational] institution located in the city of
 Corpus Christi.
 (b)  Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi [The upper-level
 institution] is a component institution of The Texas A&M University
 System and is under the management and control of the board of
 regents of The Texas A&M University System.
 (c) [(b)]  The board has the same powers and duties
 concerning Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi as are conferred on
 the board [it] by statute concerning Texas A&M University.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *