Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB652 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 652
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2011; March 8, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 7, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 652 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to governmental entities subject to the sunset review
 process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 ARTICLE 1.  ENTITIES GIVEN 2013 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 1.01.  GUARDIANSHIP CERTIFICATION BOARD. Section
 111.003, Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 111.003.  SUNSET PROVISION. The board is subject to
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued
 in existence as provided by that chapter, the board is abolished and
 this chapter expires September 1, 2013 [2015].
 SECTION 1.02.  INTERAGENCY TASK FORCE FOR CHILDREN WITH
 SPECIAL NEEDS.  Section 115.012, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 Chapters 835 (S.B. 1824) and 1133 (H.B. 2196), Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 115.012.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Interagency Task Force
 for Children With Special Needs is subject to Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence
 as provided by that chapter, the task force is abolished and this
 chapter expires September 1, 2013 [2015].
 SECTION 1.03.  WINDHAM SCHOOL DISTRICT WITHIN TEXAS
 DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE. Chapter 19, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 19.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 19.0021.  LIMITED PURPOSE REVIEW. (a)  As part of its
 review of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice for the 83rd
 Legislature, the Sunset Advisory Commission shall conduct a limited
 purpose review of the structure, management, and operations of the
 Windham School District.
 (b)  The Sunset Advisory Commission shall include in the
 commission's report to the 83rd Legislature any recommendations
 relating to the Windham School District that the commission
 considers appropriate.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2013.
 ARTICLE 2.  ENTITIES GIVEN 2019 SUNSET DATE
 SECTION 2.01.  LICENSED COURT INTERPRETER ADVISORY BOARD.
 Section 57.051, Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 57.051.  SUNSET. The licensed court interpreter
 advisory board is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas
 Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that
 chapter, the board is abolished and this subchapter expires
 September 1, 2019 [2013].
 ARTICLE 3.  ENTITIES REMOVED FROM SPECIFIC SUNSET REVIEW
 SECTION 3.01.  BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE OFFICIAL CITRUS
 PRODUCERS' PEST AND DISEASE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION.  Section
 80.028, Agriculture Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 80.028.  DISSOLUTION [SUNSET] PROVISION. (a)  [The
 board of directors of the official citrus producers' pest and
 disease management corporation is subject to Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).     Unless continued in existence
 as provided by that chapter, the board is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2021.
 [(b)]  The commissioner may order the dissolution of the
 corporation at any time the commissioner determines that the
 purposes of this chapter have been fulfilled or that the
 corporation is inoperative and abandoned.  Dissolution shall be
 conducted in accordance with Section 80.014.
 (b) [(c)]  If the corporation [is abolished] or the
 suppression program is discontinued for any reason, assessments
 approved, levied, or otherwise collectible on the date of
 discontinuance [abolishment] remain valid as necessary to pay the
 financial obligations of the corporation.
 ARTICLE 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE
 SECTION 4.01.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *