Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB654 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire, Hegar S.B. No. 654
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2011; March 8, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 March 31, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 31, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 654 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Public
 Finance Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1232.072, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1232.072.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Texas Public Finance
 Authority is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the authority
 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2011].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1232.073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1232.073.  NEGOTIATED RULEMAKING AND ALTERNATIVE
 DISPUTE RESOLUTION. (a)  The board shall develop and implement a
 policy to encourage the use of:
 (1)  negotiated rulemaking procedures under Chapter
 2008 for the adoption of authority rules; and
 (2)  appropriate alternative dispute resolution
 procedures under Chapter 2009 to assist in the resolution of
 internal and external disputes under the authority's jurisdiction.
 (b)  The authority's procedures relating to alternative
 dispute resolution must conform, to the extent possible, to any
 model guidelines issued by the State Office of Administrative
 Hearings for the use of alternative dispute resolution by state
 agencies.
 (c)  The authority shall:
 (1)  coordinate the implementation of the policy
 adopted under Subsection (a);
 (2)  provide training as needed to implement the
 procedures for negotiated rulemaking or alternative dispute
 resolution; and
 (3)  collect data concerning the effectiveness of those
 procedures.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1232.101, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1232.101.  ISSUANCE OF BONDS FOR CERTAIN STATE
 AGENCIES.  (a)  With respect to all bonds authorized to be issued by
 or on behalf of the adjutant general's department, Parks and
 Wildlife Department, Texas Agricultural Finance Authority, Texas
 Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Authority[, Stephen F. Austin
 State University], Midwestern State University, and Texas Southern
 University, the authority has the exclusive authority to act on
 behalf of those entities in issuing bonds on their behalf.  In
 connection with those issuances and with the issuance of refunding
 bonds on behalf of those entities, the authority is subject to all
 rights, duties, and conditions surrounding issuance previously
 applicable to the issuing entity under the statute authorizing the
 issuance.  A reference in an authorizing statute to the entity on
 whose behalf the bonds are being issued applies equally to the
 authority in its capacity as issuer on behalf of the entity.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (a), the authority may,
 under an agreement entered into with Texas State Technical College
 System or a general academic teaching institution as defined by
 Section 61.003, Education Code, act on behalf of Texas State
 Technical College System or a general academic teaching institution
 in issuing bonds on the system's or institution's behalf.  In
 connection with those issuances and with the issuance of refunding
 bonds on behalf of the system or those institutions, the authority
 is subject to all rights, duties, and conditions surrounding
 issuance previously applicable to the issuing system or institution
 under the statute authorizing the issuance.  A reference in an
 authorizing statute to the system or institution on whose behalf
 the bonds are being issued applies equally to the authority in its
 capacity as issuer on behalf of the system or institution.  An
 agreement under this subsection may provide for reimbursement to
 the authority for costs incurred in issuing bonds under the
 agreement.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1232.1221 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1232.1221.  COMMENCEMENT OF CERTAIN MULTIYEAR
 CANCER-RELATED PROJECTS. A multiyear project for which funds are
 granted by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas
 Oversight Committee as authorized by Section 102.257, Health and
 Safety Code, may begin after:
 (1)  the authority has certified that obligations in an
 amount sufficient to pay the money needed to fund the project have
 been authorized for issuance by the authority and approved by the
 Bond Review Board; or
 (2)  the proceeds have been deposited into the state
 treasury and:
 (A)  the comptroller has certified that the
 proceeds are available;
 (B)  the reserve funds and capitalized interest,
 as certified by the authority as reasonably required, have been
 paid; and
 (C)  the costs of issuing the obligations, as
 certified by the authority, have been paid.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (c), Section 55.13, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 with respect to all bonds authorized to be issued by Midwestern
 State University[, Stephen F. Austin State University,] or Texas
 Southern University, the Texas Public Finance Authority shall
 exercise the authority of a board to issue bonds on behalf of those
 institutions, in the manner provided by this subchapter, including
 the authority to issue refunding bonds under Section 55.19. In
 connection with the issuance of bonds under this chapter, the Texas
 Public Finance Authority has all the rights and duties granted or
 assigned to and is subject to the same conditions as a board under
 this chapter.
 SECTION 6.  Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.257.  MULTIYEAR PROJECTS.  The oversight committee
 may grant funds for a multiyear project.  The oversight committee
 must specify the total amount of [All the] money approved [needed]
 to fund the [a] multiyear project.  The total amount specified is
 considered for purposes of this subchapter to have been [must be]
 awarded in the state fiscal year that the project is approved by the
 research and prevention programs committee.  The institute shall
 distribute only the money that will be expended during that fiscal
 year.  The remaining money shall be [maintained in an escrow account
 to be] distributed by the institute as the money is needed in each
 subsequent fiscal year [years of the project].
 SECTION 7.  (a)  The changes in law made by this Act apply
 only to a grant of funds for a multiyear project by the Cancer
 Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee as
 authorized by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, as amended
 by this Act, made on or after September 1, 2011. A grant of funds
 for a multiyear project made before that date is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the grant was made, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  The changes in law made by this Act to Section 55.13,
 Education Code, and Section 1232.101, Government Code, apply only
 to bonds authorized on or after the effective date of this Act.
 Bonds authorized before that date are governed by the law in effect
 on the date the bonds were authorized, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *