Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB66 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 66
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 27, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 27, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 66 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of a student from the school district of
 the student's residence to another district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.036, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read
 as follows:
 (a)  Any child, other than a high school graduate, who is
 younger than 21 years of age and eligible for enrollment on
 September 1 of any school year may transfer [annually] from the
 child's school district of residence to another district in this
 state if both the receiving district and the applicant parent or
 guardian or person having lawful control of the child jointly
 approve and timely agree in writing to the transfer.
 (c)  The transfer agreement may authorize the receiving
 school district to revoke, at any time during the school year, the
 approval of the child to transfer if the child:
 (1)  fails to comply with a condition specified in the
 agreement that is:
 (A)  a circumstance specified in the student code
 of conduct under Section 37.001(a)(1);
 (B)  a condition specified in the student code of
 conduct under Section 37.001(a)(2);
 (C)  conduct for which a student is required or
 permitted to be removed from class and placed in a disciplinary
 alternative education program under Section 37.006; or
 (D)  conduct for which a student is required or
 permitted to be expelled from school under Section 37.007; or
 (2)  fails to maintain a specified school attendance
 rate.
 (d)  If a transfer approval is revoked under Subsection (c),
 the receiving school district shall refund an amount of any tuition
 fee paid under Section 25.038 proportionate to any portion of the
 school year remaining after the revocation and for which the fee was
 paid.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *