Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB681 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 5, 2011      TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB681 by West (Relating to the establishment of a task force to study the assessments of children in the child welfare system.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would establish a Child Welfare Assessment Task Force; require the task force to submit a report with recommendations by December 1, 2012; and require the Department of Family and Protective Services to adopt policies that incorporate the recommendations by September 1, 2013.  The bill would be effective immediately with a two-thirds vote of all members of each house, or on September 1, 2011.  The law would expire on September 1, 2014.  The fiscal implication of adopting task force recommendations cannot be determined.  It is assumed that any other cost to implement the provisions of the bill would be minimal and can be absorbed within available resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of   LBB Staff:  JOB, CL, MB, NM, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 5, 2011





  TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB681 by West (Relating to the establishment of a task force to study the assessments of children in the child welfare system.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB681 by West (Relating to the establishment of a task force to study the assessments of children in the child welfare system.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Honorable Richard Pena Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB681 by West (Relating to the establishment of a task force to study the assessments of children in the child welfare system.), As Engrossed

SB681 by West (Relating to the establishment of a task force to study the assessments of children in the child welfare system.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would establish a Child Welfare Assessment Task Force; require the task force to submit a report with recommendations by December 1, 2012; and require the Department of Family and Protective Services to adopt policies that incorporate the recommendations by September 1, 2013.  The bill would be effective immediately with a two-thirds vote of all members of each house, or on September 1, 2011.  The law would expire on September 1, 2014.  The fiscal implication of adopting task force recommendations cannot be determined.  It is assumed that any other cost to implement the provisions of the bill would be minimal and can be absorbed within available resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, MB, NM, VJC

 JOB, CL, MB, NM, VJC