Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB682 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 682
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2011; February 23, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to criminal history record information that
 relates to a person who is an applicant for appointment to an
 appraisal review board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 411.1296, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1296.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION: EMPLOYMENT BY APPRAISAL DISTRICT AND APPOINTMENT TO
 APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD.
 SECTION 2.  Section 411.1296, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), an appraisal
 district established by Section 6.01, Tax Code, is entitled to
 obtain from the department criminal history record information
 maintained by the department that relates to a person who is an
 applicant for employment by the appraisal district or for
 appointment to the appraisal review board for the appraisal
 district.
 (c)  If the members of the appraisal review board of an
 appraisal district are appointed by the local administrative
 district judge, the appraisal district may provide criminal history
 record information obtained under this section to the local
 administrative district judge or to the appraisal review board
 commissioners appointed by the local administrative district
 judge.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *