Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB711 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jackson S.B. No. 711
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2011; February 23, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Select Committee on Open
 Government; March 31, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; March 31, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain identifying information
 regarding students of career schools or colleges and other
 educational entities; providing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 132, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 132.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 132.024.  STUDENT INFORMATION; OFFENSE; PENALTY.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Student" means any prospective, current, or
 former student of:
 (A)  a career school or college; or
 (B)  any other school, educational institution,
 or business entity from which the commission receives, or regarding
 which the commission reviews, information through its
 administration or enforcement of this chapter.
 (2)  "Student information" means identifying
 information in the commission's possession regarding a student.
 The term includes:
 (A)  a student's name, address, telephone number,
 social security number, e-mail address, or date of birth;
 (B)  any other identifying number or other
 information that foreseeably could be combined with other publicly
 available information to reveal identifying information regarding
 the student; and
 (C)  a student's education records, as defined by
 34 C.F.R. Section 99.3.
 (b)  Student information is not public information for
 purposes of Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (c)  Unless permitted by Subchapter F, Chapter 301, Labor
 Code, or commission rule, a person commits an offense if the person
 solicits, discloses, receives, or uses, or authorizes, permits,
 participates in, or acquiesces in another person's use of, student
 information.
 (d)  An offense under Subsection (c) is a Class A
 misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *