Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB773 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 773


 AN ACT
 relating to telecommunications service discounts for educational
 institutions, libraries, hospitals, and telemedicine centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58.252, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Health center" means a federally qualified
 health center service delivery site.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 58.253, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  On customer request, an electing company shall provide
 private network services to:
 (1)  an educational institution;
 (2)  a library as defined in Section 57.021;
 (3)  a nonprofit telemedicine center;
 (4)  a public or not-for-profit hospital; [or]
 (5)  a legally constituted consortium or group of
 entities listed in this subsection; or
 (6)  a health center.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (b), Section 58.255, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An electing company shall offer private network service
 contracts under this subchapter at 110 [105] percent of the long run
 incremental cost of providing the private network service,
 including installation.
 SECTION 4.  Subsection (a), Section 58.258, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding the pricing flexibility authorized by
 this subtitle, an electing company's rates for private network
 services may not be increased before January 1, 2016 [2012].
 However, an electing company may increase a rate in accordance with
 the provisions of a customer specific contract.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (b), Section 58.259, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The tariff rate may not be:
 (1)  distance sensitive; or
 (2)  higher than 110 [105] percent of the service's
 statewide average long run incremental cost, including
 installation.
 SECTION 6.  Subsection (c), Section 58.260, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The rate for the service may not be higher than 110 [105]
 percent of the service's long run incremental cost, including
 installation.
 SECTION 7.  Subsection (b), Section 58.261, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The rate for the service may not be higher than 110 [105]
 percent of the service's long run incremental cost, including
 installation.
 SECTION 8.  Section 58.268, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 58.268.  CONTINUATION OF OBLIGATION. Notwithstanding
 any other provision of this title, an electing company shall
 continue to comply with this subchapter until January 1, 2016
 [2012], regardless of:
 (1)  the date the company elected under this chapter;
 or
 (2)  any action taken in relation to that company under
 Chapter 65.
 SECTION 9.  Subsection (a), Section 59.077, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding the pricing flexibility authorized by
 this subtitle, an electing company's rates for private network
 services may not be increased before January 1, 2016 [2012].
 SECTION 10.  Section 59.083, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 59.083.  CONTINUATION OF OBLIGATION. Notwithstanding
 any other provision of this title, an electing company shall
 continue to comply with this subchapter until January 1, 2016
 [2012], regardless of:
 (1)  the date the company elected under this chapter;
 or
 (2)  any action taken in relation to that company under
 Chapter 65.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 773 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 3;
 May 25, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 27,
 Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 773 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 111,
 Nays 28, two present not voting; May 27, 2011, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 109, Nays 37, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor