S.B. No. 796 AN ACT relating to reporting on and assessing programs for the prevention and treatment of diabetes in the state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Chapter 95A to read as follows: CHAPTER 95A. REPORTS ON PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DIABETES Sec. 95A.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services Commission. (2) "Council" means the Texas Diabetes Council. Sec. 95A.002. BIENNIAL REPORT ON COMMISSION'S PRIORITIES FOR ADDRESSING DIABETES. (a) The commission, in coordination with the council, shall prepare a biennial report that identifies the commission's priorities for addressing diabetes within the Medicaid population. (b) Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year, the commission shall submit the report to the legislature and the governor. Sec. 95A.003. REPORT ON COSTS OF PREVENTING AND TREATING DIABETES. (a) Not later than December 1, 2012, the commission and the council shall prepare and post on the commission's Internet website a report for elected officials and other policy makers that contains an estimate of the annual direct and indirect costs to both the public and private sectors of preventing diabetes and treating individuals with diabetes in this state. (b) This section expires September 1, 2013. SECTION 2. Chapter 103, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 103.0131 to read as follows: Sec. 103.0131. ASSESSMENT OF PROGRAMS TO PREVENT AND TREAT DIABETES. (a) In conjunction with developing each state plan described in Section 103.013, the council shall conduct a statewide assessment of existing programs for the prevention of diabetes and treatment of individuals with diabetes that are administered by the Health and Human Services Commission or a health and human services agency, as defined by Section 531.001, Government Code. As part of the assessment, the council shall collect data regarding: (1) the number of individuals served by the programs; (2) the areas where services to prevent diabetes and treat individuals with diabetes are unavailable; and (3) the number of health care providers treating individuals with diabetes under the programs. (b) Not later than November 1 of each odd-numbered year, the council shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the legislature a written report containing the findings of the assessment conducted under Subsection (a). SECTION 3. (a) Not later than December 1, 2012, the Health and Human Services Commission shall submit the initial report required by Section 95A.002, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than November 1, 2013, the Texas Diabetes Council shall conduct and submit a report on the initial assessment required by Section 103.0131, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 796 passed the Senate on March 17, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 796 passed the House on May 23, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor