Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB81 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 81


 AN ACT
 relating to food safety.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 431.2211, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person is not required to hold a license under this
 subchapter if the person is:
 (1)  a person, firm, or corporation that only harvests,
 packages, or washes[, or ships] raw fruits or vegetables for
 shipment at the location of harvest;
 (2)  an individual who only sells prepackaged
 nonperishable foods, including dietary supplements, from a private
 home as a direct seller;
 (3)  a person who holds a license under Chapter 432 and
 who only engages in conduct within the scope of that license; or
 (4)  a restaurant that provides food for immediate
 human consumption to a political subdivision or to a licensed
 nonprofit organization if the restaurant would not otherwise be
 required to hold a license under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (b), Section 431.226, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The board by rule shall establish minimum standards for
 granting and maintaining a license. In adopting rules under this
 section, the board shall:
 (1)  ensure that the minimum standards prioritize safe
 handling of fruits and vegetables based on known safety risks,
 including any history of outbreaks of food-borne communicable
 diseases; and
 (2)  consider acceptable produce safety standards
 developed by a federal agency, state agency, or university.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter J, Chapter 431, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 431.227 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.227.  FOOD SAFETY BEST PRACTICE EDUCATION PROGRAM.
 (a)  The department shall approve food safety best practice
 education programs for places of business licensed under this
 chapter.
 (b)  A place of business that completes a food safety best
 practice education program approved by the department shall receive
 a certificate valid for five years from the date of completion of
 the program.
 (c)  When determining which places of business to inspect
 under Section 431.042, the appropriate inspecting authority shall
 consider whether the place of business holds a valid certificate
 from a food safety best practice education program under this
 section.
 (d)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement this section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 431.244, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  For any federal regulation adopted as a state rule under
 this chapter, including a regulation considered to be a rule for
 purposes of this chapter under Subsection (a), (b), or (c), the
 Department of State Health Services shall provide on its Internet
 website:
 (1)  a link to the text of the federal regulation;
 (2)  a clear explanation of the substance of and
 purpose for the regulation; and
 (3)  information on providing comments in response to
 any proposed or pending federal regulation, including an address to
 which and the manner in which comments may be submitted.
 SECTION 5.  Section 437.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subdivisions (1) and (3) and adding
 Subdivisions (2-a), (2-b), (3-a), and (5) to read as follows:
 (1)  "Board" means the executive commissioner [Texas
 Board of Health].
 (2-a)  "Baked good" includes cookies, cakes, breads,
 Danish, donuts, pastries, pies, and other items that are prepared
 by baking the item in an oven.  A baked good does not include a
 potentially hazardous food item as defined by department rule.
 (2-b)  "Cottage food production operation" means an
 individual, operating out of the individual's home, who:
 (A)  produces a baked good, a canned jam or jelly,
 or a dried herb or herb mix for sale at the person's home;
 (B)  has an annual gross income of $50,000 or less
 from the sale of food described by Paragraph (A); and
 (C)  sells the foods produced under Paragraph (A)
 only directly to consumers.
 (3)  "Department" means the [Texas] Department of State
 Health Services.
 (3-a)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (5)  "Home" means a primary residence that contains a
 kitchen and appliances designed for common residential usage.
 SECTION 6.  Chapter 437, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Sections 437.0191, 437.0192, 437.0193, and 437.0194 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 437.0191.  EXEMPTION FOR COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION
 OPERATIONS. A cottage food production operation is not a food
 service establishment for purposes of this chapter.
 Sec. 437.0192.  REGULATION OF COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION
 OPERATIONS BY LOCAL HEALTH DEPARTMENT PROHIBITED; COMPLAINTS.
 (a)  A local health department may not regulate the production of
 food at a cottage food production operation.
 (b)  Each local health department and the department shall
 maintain a record of a complaint made by a person against a cottage
 food production operation.
 Sec. 437.0193.  LABELING REQUIREMENTS FOR COTTAGE FOOD
 PRODUCTION OPERATIONS. The executive commissioner shall adopt
 rules requiring a cottage food production operation to label all of
 the foods described in Section 437.001(2-b)(A) that the operation
 sells to consumers.  The label must include the name and address of
 the cottage food production operation and a statement that the food
 is not inspected by the department or a local health department.
 Sec. 437.0194.  SALES BY COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION OPERATIONS
 THROUGH THE INTERNET PROHIBITED. A cottage food production
 operation may not sell any of the foods described in Section
 437.001(2-b)(A) through the Internet.
 SECTION 7.  Chapter 437, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Sections 437.0201 and 437.0202 to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.0201.  REGULATION OF FOOD AT FARMERS' MARKETS UNDER
 TEMPORARY FOOD ESTABLISHMENT PERMITS. (a)  In this section,
 "farmers' market" means a designated location used primarily for
 the distribution and sale directly to consumers of food products by
 farmers or other producers.
 (b)  The department or a local health department may issue a
 temporary food establishment permit to a person who sells food at a
 farmers' market without limiting the number of days for which the
 permit is effective to the number of days during which the farmers'
 market takes place.
 (c)  A permit issued under Subsection (b) may be valid for up
 to one year and may be renewed on expiration.
 (d)  This section does not apply to a farmers' market in a
 county:
 (1)  that has a population of less than 50,000; and
 (2)  over which no local health department has
 jurisdiction.
 Sec. 437.0202.  TEMPERATURE REQUIREMENTS FOR FOOD AT
 FARMERS' MARKETS. (a)  In this section, "farmers' market" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 437.0201.
 (b)  The executive commissioner by rule may adopt
 temperature requirements for food sold at, prepared on-site at, or
 transported to or from a farmers' market under Section 437.020 or
 437.0201. Food prepared on-site at a farmers' market may be sold or
 distributed at the farmers' market only if the food is prepared in
 compliance with the temperature requirements adopted under this
 section.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), the executive
 commissioner or a state or local enforcement agency may not mandate
 a specific method for complying with the temperature control
 requirements adopted under Subsection (b).
 (d)  The municipality in which a municipally owned farmers'
 market is located may adopt rules specifying the method or methods
 that must be used to comply with the temperature control
 requirements adopted under Subsection (b).
 (e)  This section does not apply to a farmers' market in a
 county:
 (1)  that has a population of less than 50,000; and
 (2)  over which no local health department has
 jurisdiction.
 SECTION 8.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 (b)  Subsection (a), Section 431.2211, Health and Safety
 Code, as amended by this Act, takes effect September 1, 2012.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 81 passed the Senate on
 March 17, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2011, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 81 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 131,
 Nays 17, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor