Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB81 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 81
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; February 22, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; February 22, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to food manufacturers, food wholesalers, and warehouse
 operators required to hold a license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 431.2211, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person is not required to hold a license under this
 subchapter if the person is:
 (1)  a person, firm, or corporation that only harvests,
 packages, or washes[, or ships] raw fruits or vegetables for
 shipment at the location of harvest;
 (2)  an individual who only sells prepackaged
 nonperishable foods, including dietary supplements, from a private
 home as a direct seller;
 (3)  a person who holds a license under Chapter 432 and
 who only engages in conduct within the scope of that license; or
 (4)  a restaurant that provides food for immediate
 human consumption to a political subdivision or to a licensed
 nonprofit organization if the restaurant would not otherwise be
 required to hold a license under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2012.
 * * * * *