Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB810 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 810
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2011; March 1, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
 Affairs; April 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 April 7, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 810 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the boundaries of the Ingleside Cove Wildlife
 Sanctuary.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 82.501, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 82.501.  CREATION. The Ingleside Cove Wildlife
 Sanctuary is composed of an area in San Patricio and Nueces counties
 described as follows:
 BEGINNING at Kinney Bayou on the east shoreline of
 Ingleside Cove, also known as North Shore Channel (N 27 50.791, W 97
 13.577);
 THENCE, in a northwesterly direction along the
 shoreline to the channel marker at the location commonly known as
 Donnel Point (N 27 51.593, W 97 14.505);
 THENCE, due northwest crossing the Reynolds Channel to
 the east side of a spoil bank (N 27 51.668, W 97 14.715);
 THENCE, following the eastern edge of this spoil bank in
 a southeasterly direction to its southernmost point (N 27 50.328, W
 97 14.302), continuing southeast crossing Ingleside Cut to the
 north shore of Ingleside Point (N 27 50.231, W 97 14.197);
 THENCE, in an easterly and southeasterly direction
 along the east shoreline following the Reynolds Channel through
 Ingleside Point to the southernmost portion of this cut (N 27
 49.782, W 97 13.782);
 THENCE, due east across the Reynolds Channel to the west
 shoreline of the mainland known as the southernmost portion of
 Ingleside Cove (N 27 49.834, W 97 13.641);
 THENCE, following the shoreline in a northerly
 direction being the east shoreline of Ingleside Cove to the point of
 beginning
 [BEGINNING at Kinney Bayou on the east shoreline of
 Ingleside Cove, also known as North Shore Channel;
 [THENCE, in a northwesterly direction along the
 shoreline to channel marker number "22" with a flashing red light
 every 4 seconds known as Donnel Point;
 [THENCE, due west crossing the Reynolds Channel to the
 east side of a spoil bank;
 [THENCE, following the eastern edge of this spoil bank
 in a southeasterly direction to its southern most point, continuing
 southeast crossing Ingleside cut to the north shore of Ingleside
 Point;
 [THENCE, in an easterly and southeasterly direction
 along the east shoreline following the Reynolds Channel through
 Ingleside Point to the southern most portion of this cut;
 [THENCE, due east across the Reynolds Channel to the
 west shoreline of the mainland known as the southern most portion of
 Ingleside Cove;
 [THENCE, following the shoreline in a northerly
 direction being the east shoreline of Ingleside Cove to the point of
 beginning].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *