Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB821 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 821
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2011; March 1, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 28, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 28, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Travis County Healthcare District
 to make capital or financial contributions to charitable
 organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (d), Section 281.0565, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  A district created in a county with a population of more
 than 800,000 that was not included in the boundaries of a hospital
 district before September 1, 2003, may make a capital or other
 financial contribution to:
 (1)  a charitable organization created by the district
 to provide regional administration and delivery of health care
 services to or for the district; or
 (2)  a charitable organization for the support of
 medical, dental, or clinical education, training, or research
 occurring within the district for the purpose of delivery of health
 care services to or for the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *