Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB850 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 850
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2011; March 1, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 14, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 14, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 850 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to formula funding for certain semester credit hours
 earned for dual course credit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.059, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (p) to read as follows:
 (p)  In its instruction and operations formula applicable to
 an institution of higher education, the board may not include any
 semester credit hours earned for dual course credit by a high school
 student for high school and college credit at the institution
 unless those credit hours are earned through any of the following:
 (1)  a course in the core curriculum of the institution
 providing course credit;
 (2)  a career and technical education course that
 applies to any certificate or associate's degree offered by the
 institution providing course credit; and
 (3)  a foreign language course.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *