Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB86 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 86
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 17, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to municipal contracts for enforcement of outstanding
 traffic violation arrest warrants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 702.002, Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *