Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB879 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 879
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2011; March 1, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 14, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a local community supervision and corrections
 department monitoring certain conditions of bond and the
 administrative fees associated with certain department services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 17.441, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  If a magistrate designates the community supervision
 and corrections department serving the county in which the
 defendant lives as the designated agency to verify installation of
 the device and to monitor the device under Subsection (d), the
 magistrate may require the defendant to pay a monthly
 administrative fee under Section 76.015, Government Code, in lieu
 of the fee otherwise required by Subsection (d).  The defendant
 shall pay the initial fee under Section 76.015, Government Code, at
 the time the community supervision and corrections department
 verifies the installation of the device.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (c), Section 76.015, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A department may assess a reasonable administrative fee
 of not less than $25 and not more than $60 [$40] per month on an
 individual who participates in a department program or receives
 department services and who is not paying a monthly fee under
 Section 19, Article 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 3.  Section 103.0211, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 103.0211.  ADDITIONAL FEES AND COSTS IN CRIMINAL OR
 CIVIL CASES:  GOVERNMENT CODE. An accused or defendant, or a party
 to a civil suit, as applicable, shall pay the following fees and
 costs under the Government Code if ordered by the court or otherwise
 required:
 (1)  a court reporter fee when testimony is taken:
 (A)  in a criminal court in Dallas County (Sec.
 25.0593, Government Code) . . . $3;
 (B)  in a county criminal court of appeals in
 Dallas County (Sec. 25.0594, Government Code) . . . $3;
 (C)  in a county court at law in McLennan County
 (Sec. 25.1572, Government Code) . . . $3; and
 (D)  in a county criminal court in Tarrant County
 (Sec. 25.2223, Government Code) . . . $3;
 (2)  a court reporter service fee if the courts have
 official court reporters (Sec. 51.601, Government Code) . . . $15
 or, in specified counties, $30;
 (3)  a speedy trial filing fee in El Paso County (Sec.
 54.745, Government Code) . . . $100;
 (4)  costs for use of magistrate in Brazos County (Sec.
 54.1116, Government Code) . . . not to exceed $50;
 (5)  the costs of a criminal magistrate if the court
 determines that the nonprevailing party is able to defray the
 costs:
 (A)  in Bexar County (Sec. 54.913, Government
 Code) . . . magistrate's fees;
 (B)  in Dallas County (Sec. 54.313, Government
 Code) . . . magistrate's fees;
 (C)  in Lubbock County (Sec. 54.883, Government
 Code) . . . magistrate's fees;
 (D)  in Tarrant County (Sec. 54.663, Government
 Code) . . . magistrate's fees;
 (E)  in Travis County (Sec. 54.983, Government
 Code) . . . magistrate's fees; and
 (F)  in Williamson County (Sec. 54.958,
 Government Code) . . . expense of the magistrate;
 (6)  an administrative fee for participation in certain
 community supervision programs (Sec. 76.015, Government Code)
 . . . not less than $25 and not more than $60 [$40] per month; and
 (7)  fee paid on filing a petition for an order of
 nondisclosure of criminal history record information in certain
 cases (Sec. 411.081, Government Code) . . . $28.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a defendant charged with an offense committed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A defendant charged with an offense
 committed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this
 section, an offense was committed before the effective date of this
 Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *