Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB882 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 882
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2011; March 1, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 28, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 28, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the filing of a copy of certain records related to the
 release of accused persons on personal bond.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 5, Article 17.42, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A personal bond pretrial release office established
 under this article shall:
 (1)  prepare a record containing information about any
 accused person identified by case number only who, after review by
 the office, is released by a court on personal bond;
 (2)  update the record on a monthly basis; and
 (3)  file [post] a copy of the record in the office of
 the clerk of the county court in any county served by the office.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a record made on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 record made before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the record was made, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *