Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB890 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 890
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2011; March 1, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 9, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 9, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain promotional activities for certain alcoholic
 beverage permit holders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 108, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 108.042 to read as follows:
 Sec. 108.042.  ACTS OF PROMOTIONAL OR COURTESY NATURE: WINE
 DISPENSING. The commission shall adopt rules that set definite
 limitations, consistent with the general provisions of this code,
 relaxing the restrictions of Section 102.07 to allow the holder of a
 wholesaler's, general class B wholesaler's, or local class B
 wholesaler's permit or the permit holder's agent to perform the
 cleaning and maintenance of coil connections for the dispensing of
 wine.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *