Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR3 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.C.R. No. 3


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 BE IT RESOLVED by the 82nd Legislature, That a joint
 committee, composed of six members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor and six members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house, arrange for the canvass of
 the votes cast for governor and lieutenant governor at the general
 election held on November 2, 2010, and that a joint session of the
 senate and house be held in the hall of the house of representatives
 at 10:00 a.m., on Thursday, January 13, 2011, for the purpose of
 counting the votes, receiving the report, and hearing the
 declaration of the results of the canvass; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the senate and house of representatives sit in
 joint session at 11:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 18, 2011, for the
 inauguration of the governor-elect and lieutenant governor-elect
 of Texas as determined by the canvass of the votes; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That a joint committee, composed of five members of
 the senate appointed by the lieutenant governor and five members of
 the house of representatives appointed by the speaker of the house,
 make arrangements for the joint session and oath-taking ceremony on
 January 18, 2011; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the Department of Public Safety of the State
 of Texas be, and is hereby, instructed to close all vehicle
 entrances to the Capitol grounds on Tuesday, January 18, 2011,
 except for those vehicles approved by the inaugural committee as
 necessary for use in connection with the ceremony and the program
 following.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 3 was adopted by the Senate
 on January 11, 2011.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 3 was adopted by the House
 on January 12, 2011.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor