Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR16 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.J.R. No. 16


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the appraisal
 for ad valorem tax purposes of open-space land devoted to
 water-stewardship purposes on the basis of its productive capacity.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 1-d-1, Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To promote the preservation of open-space land, the
 legislature shall provide by general law for taxation of open-space
 land devoted to farm, ranch, [or] wildlife management, or
 water-stewardship purposes on the basis of its productive capacity
 and may provide by general law for taxation of open-space land
 devoted to timber production on the basis of its productive
 capacity.  The legislature by general law may provide eligibility
 limitations under this section and may impose sanctions in
 furtherance of the taxation policy of this section.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, providing for the appraisal for ad valorem
 tax purposes of open-space land devoted to water-stewardship
 purposes on the basis of its productive capacity.
 (b)  The amendment to Section 1-d-1(a), Article VIII, of this
 constitution takes effect January 1, 2012.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2011.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment providing for the
 appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of open-space land devoted to
 water-stewardship purposes on the basis of its productive
 capacity."
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 16 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 12, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 16 was adopted by the House
 on May 21, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House